Party: Free Democratic Party (FDP)
Born on: 01.04.1936
Place of origin: Longirod
Canton: Vaud (VD)
Election: 07.12.1983
Resignation: 31.03.1998
Deceased: 04.10.1998
Successor to Federal Councillor: Georges-André Chevallaz
Predecessor to Federal Councillor: Pascal Couchepin
Details of elections to the Federal Council
Elected on 1. ballot with 130 votes
Ballots distributed: 246
Ballots received: 246
Blank ballots: 2
Spoiled ballots: 3
Valid ballots: 241
Absolute majority: 121
Further votes received:
Robert Ducret GE (53), Monique Bauer GE (34), Pier-Felice Barchi TI (19), Verschiedene/ divers (5)
Heads of Department
Year
Department
Substitute
1998
Federal Department of Economic Affairs (FDEA)
1987 - 1997
Federal Department of Economic Affairs (FDEA)
1984 - 1986
Federal Department of Defence; Federal Military Department (EMD)